Soucy, Louis Joseph (CPSO#: 63032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: (613) 798-2980
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louis Soucy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Soucy ( CPSO# 63032 )

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUIS JOSEPH SOUCY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUCY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990