Soulios, Christos (CPSO#: 54177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek, Macedonian

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 778-6534
Fax: (416) 778-9990
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOS SOULIOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOULIOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1988