Souque, Katryn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 106892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017