Sourial, Fibi Bassily (CPSO#: 63151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bramelea city center BCC
Brampton ON  L5R 1L5
Phone: (905) 793-7077
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIBI BASSILY SOURIAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOURIAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1995