Sourovtseva, Elena Anatolyevna (CPSO#: 81773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Saratov State Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Health Care
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 815-2571
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sourovtseva Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Sourovtseva ( CPSO# 81773 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare
New Oakville Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA ANATOLYEVNA SOUROVTSEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUROVTSEVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 20 Oct 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2004 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006