Southerland, Lucy Claire (CPSO#: 57196)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 1995

Summary

Former Name: McMillan, Lucy Claire (used until: 28 Sep 1988 )

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Mar 1995
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Oct 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1995