Southey, Robert George Hughson (CPSO#: 52383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dorval Medical Associates
Family Health Team
465 Morden Road
Suite 104
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone: (905) 842-7154
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Found Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Southey ( CPSO# 52383 )
Dr. M. Found ( CPSO# 59377 )

Business Address:
104 - 465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone Number: (905) 842-7154


Corporation Name: Southey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Southey ( CPSO# 52383 )
Dr. M. Found ( CPSO# 59377 )

Business Address:
Dorval Medical Associates
Suite 104
465 Morden Road
Oakville ON  L6K 3W6
Phone Number: (905) 842-7154

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GEORGE HUGHSON SOUTHEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOUTHEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983