Sovran, Steven Alessandro (CPSO#: 84373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
The Boris Clinic 4Z
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76061
Fax: 905-521-2653
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven A. Sovran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sovran ( CPSO# 84373 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
The Boris Clinic 4Z
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ALESSANDRO SOVRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOVRAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2013