Sowden, Kenneth Anthony (CPSO#: 41663)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 27 Nov 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2006