Spacek, Stan Zdenek (CPSO#: 75204)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maitland Valley Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone: (519) 524-6060
Fax: (519) 524-5225
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-8323
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Maitland Manor
290 South Street
Goderich ON  N7A 4G6
Canada
Phone: (519) 524-7324
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spacek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Spacek ( CPSO# 74874 )
Dr. S. Spacek ( CPSO# 75204 )

Business Address:
Goderich Medical Clinic
180 Cambria Road North
Goderich ON  N7A 4N8
Phone Number: (519) 524-6060

Business Address:
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Business Address:
290 South Street
Goderich ON  N7A 4G6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STAN ZDENEK SPACEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPACEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2003