Spadafora, Peter Joseph (CPSO#: 69230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C
23 Victoria Road North
Guelph ON  N1E 5G6
Phone: (519) 823-2190
Fax: (519) 823-2191
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Spadafora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Spadafora ( CPSO# 69230 )

Business Address:
Unit C
23 Victoria Road North
Guelph ON  N1E 5G6
Phone Number: (519) 823-2190

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH SPADAFORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADAFORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997