Spadafora, Salvatore Mario (CPSO#: 62591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 602
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6709
Fax: (416) 978-7144
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Operating Room
5th Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-6709
Fax: (416) 978-7144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 602
PGME
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-6709
Fax: (416) 978-7144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Salvatore M. Spadafora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spadafora ( CPSO# 62591 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Joseph and Wolf Lebovic Health Complex
5th Floor - Operating Room
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALVATORE MARIO SPADAFORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPADAFORA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991