Spaner, David Elliot (CPSO#: 57405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Sunnybrook Odette
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5248
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Spaner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Spaner ( CPSO# 57405 )

Business Address:
Toronto Sunnybrook Regional Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ELLIOT SPANER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPANER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1986