Spanglet, Offir (CPSO#: 71407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6
Phone: (519) 578-2100
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spanglet Hubay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Spanglet ( CPSO# 71407 )
Dr. S. Hubay ( CPSO# 71485 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
25 Joseph Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 4X6

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2

Business Address:
270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0

Business Address:
2555 Elizabeth Street East
Listowel ON  N4H 3H4

Business Address:
500 Whites Road
Palmerston ON  N0G 2P0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Palmerston & District Site,North Wellington Health Care Corp Palmerston
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OFFIR SPANGLET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPANGLET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001