Spano Greco, Giuseppe (CPSO#: 65317)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Aug 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Bloor Medical Group
208 Bloor Street West
Suite 405
Toronto ON  M5S 3B4
Phone: (416) 962-1200
Fax: (416) 962-1223
Electoral District: 10

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Aug 2009 Active View Details [+]

            As from August 5, 2009, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Giuseppe Spano Greco,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Spano Greco to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                  I, Dr. Giuseppe Spano Greco, have voluntarily relinquished my prescribing
                  privileges with respect to the following drugs, substances and
                  preparations set out in Schedules I through IV of the Controlled Drugs
                  and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c. 19, as amended, and related regulations
                  (the "Act"), and summarized as follows
                  
                  Drug/Substance          Relinquished       Not Relinquished
                  
                  
                  Narcotic Drugs                x                                    
                  Narcotic Preparations         x                  
                  Controlled Drugs              x      
                  Benzodiazepines/Other         x
                  Targeted Substances