Spayne, Jacqueline Anne (CPSO#: 73708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ANNE SPAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2005