Spear, Allan Thorne (CPSO#: 19052)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Center, 11 Gibb Street. Witby, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 28 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015