Spears, Danna Adele (CPSO#: 74820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: Westergaard, Danna Adele (used until: 13 Dec 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divof Cardiology Electrophysiology
Room 4NU 492
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3535
Fax: (647) 693-7543
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNA ADELE SPEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEARS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2005