Spears, Julian (CPSO#: 72652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5667
Fax: (416) 864-5644
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIAN SPEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEARS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004