Spence, Francis Patrick (CPSO#: 53221)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Oct 1989