Spence, Jeffrey David (CPSO#: 69344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite309
460 Springbank Dr.
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 858-0013
Fax: (519) 858-3713
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Spence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 69344 )

Business Address:
460 Springbank Drive
Suite 309
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone Number: (519) 858-0013


Corporation Name: Spence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spence ( CPSO# 24518 )
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 69344 )
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 24484 )

Business Address:
1400 Western Road
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 931-5731

Business Address:
108 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-3020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care,St Thomas Mental Health Site St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997