Spence, John David (CPSO#: 24484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SPARC
1400 Western Road
London, ON
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone: (519) 931-5731
Fax: (519) 931-5737
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8300
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Spence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spence ( CPSO# 24518 )
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 69344 )
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 24484 )

Business Address:
1400 Western Road
London ON  N6G 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 931-5731

Business Address:
108 - 450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-3020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 24 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976