Spence, Julia Mary (CPSO#: 58484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Spence Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Spence ( CPSO# 58484 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA MARY SPENCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989