Spencer, Andrew Kent (CPSO#: 60913)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1950 Algonquin Avenue
Suite 206
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone: (705) 472-1030
Fax: (705) 472-4466
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spencer ( CPSO# 60913 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
1950 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Z2
Phone Number: (705) 472-1030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW KENT SPENCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990