Spencer, Lesley Margaret (CPSO#: 82745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smiths Falls Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: 613 283 2330 Ext. 1102
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N0X0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lesley Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Spencer ( CPSO# 82745 )

Business Address:
Smiths Falls Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Business Address:
Sexual Health Centre
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1B3
Phone Number: (613) 580-2424

Business Address:
65 Bank Street
4th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1P 5N2
Phone Number: (613) 567-8300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY MARGARET SPENCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007