Spencer, Mandy Lee (CPSO#: 93741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone: (807) 468-8566
Fax: (807) 468-9765
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: (807) 468-3638
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mandy L. Spencer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Spencer ( CPSO# 93741 )

Business Address:
Woodlands Medical Associates
5 - 45 Wolsley Street
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-3021

Business Address:
Lake of the Woods District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Phone Number: (807) 468-9861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANDY LEE SPENCER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENCER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 05 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 02 Jun 2011 to 29 Jun 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011