Spenler, Valerie Sara Martha Suderman (CPSO#: 56434)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: Suderman, Valerie Sara Martha (used until: 08 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anaesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE SARA MARTHA SUDERMAN SPENLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPENLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992