Spettigue, Wendy Jill (CPSO#: 63703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3609
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.J. Spettigue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Spettigue ( CPSO# 63703 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Psychiatry
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY JILL SPETTIGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPETTIGUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1992