Spevack, Leslie Mark (CPSO#: 59602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 222
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 499-1333
Fax: (416) 499-1342
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Spevack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Spevack ( CPSO# 59602 )

Business Address:
Suite 222
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 499-1333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE MARK SPEVACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPEVACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989