Spiegel, Lynn Reesa (CPSO#: 64295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Rheumatology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7711
Fax: (416) 813-4989
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Richmond Hill Children's Clinic
404-250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (416) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNN REESA SPIEGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIEGEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1991