Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Spiegel, Paul Bradley (CPSO#: 64034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Johns Hopkins Bloomberg School
of Public Health
615 N Wolfe St
Baltimore MD  21205
United States
Phone: 443 326 8050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL BRADLEY SPIEGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIEGEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 06 Sep 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1992