Spilg, Edward George (CPSO#: 105385)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2015

Expiry Date:  12 Jan 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jan 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4795
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jan 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Edward George Spilg may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Geriatrics,  University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Spilg
                        holds an academic appointment  at  the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  seven  years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Spilg  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. Spilg's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Spilg's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  January 13, 2015.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate  will,  if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on January 12, 2022.