Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Spiller, Mark Arthur (CPSO#: 60977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kirkland And District Hospital
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone: (705) 567-5251
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kirkland and District Hospital
145 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-5251
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Box 8
Matachewan ON  P0K 1M0
Canada
Phone: (705) 565-2351
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK ARTHUR SPILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPILLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990