Spindler, Eric Eugene (CPSO#: 31726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC EUGENE SPINDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPINDLER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Nov 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982