Spinner, Miriam Rachel (CPSO#: 41935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Sep 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Johns Hopkins University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department Of Psychiatry
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33535
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maryland
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRIAM RACHEL SPINNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPINNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1992