Spirou, Christos (CPSO#: 60879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-2558
Fax: (519) 735-2530
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

35 Victoria Ave., Unit 6
Essex ON  N8M 1M4
Canada
Phone: (519) 776-6856
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

186 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Canada
Phone: (519) 776-1559
Fax: (519) 776-7050
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christos Spirou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Spirou ( CPSO# 60879 )

Business Address:
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Suite 200
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-2558

Business Address:
186 Talbot Street South
Essex ON  N8M 1B6
Phone Number: (519) 776-1559

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOS SPIROU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIROU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1990