Spithoff, Sheryl Maria (CPSO#: 76622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: Torenvliet, Sheryl Maria (used until: 14 Oct 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd & 4th Floor
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone: (416) 323-6350
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheryl Spithoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Spithoff ( CPSO# 76622 )

Business Address:
77 Grenville Street
3rd and 4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Phone Number: (416) 323-6350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERYL MARIA SPITHOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPITHOFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003