Spitzer, Rachel Frida (CPSO#: 76126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
O P G B 3rd Floor
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4822
Fax: (416) 586-4657
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave, 7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 813-6188
Fax: (416) 813-7172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rachel F. Spitzer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Spitzer ( CPSO# 76126 )

Business Address:
700 University Avenue
OPGB 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4822

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
O P G B 3rd Floor
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL FRIDA SPITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPITZER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006