Spivak, Harold Isaac (CPSO#: 60023)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3085
Fax: (416) 864-5480
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harold Spivak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Spivak ( CPSO# 60023 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Suite 17-002 - Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3085

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD ISAAC SPIVAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPIVAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1989