Spotswood, Wayne Joseph (CPSO#: 24279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 1971

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE JOSEPH SPOTSWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPOTSWOOD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1971