Spouge, Alison Rosemary Isobel (CPSO#: 52724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Radiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8300 Ext. 32893
Fax: (519) 663-8803
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lee Sharma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2017


Corporation Name: A. Spouge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Spouge ( CPSO# 52724 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre - University Campus
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
339 Windermere Road
2nd Floor
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISON ROSEMARY ISOBEL SPOUGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPOUGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1984