Sprague, Celia Ann (CPSO#: 102252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority
Primary Health Care Unit
P O Bag 4000
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone: 8077384582
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Sprague Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sprague ( CPSO# 102252)

Business Address:
Sioux Lookout First Nations
Health Authority-Primary Health Care Unit
P O Bag 4000
61 Queen Street
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B8
Phone Number: (807) 737-1555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CELIA ANN SPRAGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRAGUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2013 to 20 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2014