Sprague, William David (CPSO#: 44875)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: His records remain at Hotel Dieu hospital following his resignation/retirement.
Instructions: Contact hospital.
Date Received: 17 Jan 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jan 2014