Spring, Paul (CPSO#: 25557)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 440 Jarvis Street, Toronto, ON M4Y 2H4
Date Received: 13 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016