Sproat, Ian Alan (CPSO#: 55814)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2007