Sproat, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 33153)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015