Sproule, Timothy Robert (CPSO#: 43814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
605 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1J9
Phone: (416) 439-1718
Fax: (416) 439-2526
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Evolution Rejuvenation And
Laser Centre
605 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1J 1J9
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-7546
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: 416-438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tim Sproule Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sproule ( CPSO# 43814 )

Business Address:
Evolution Rejuvenation and Laser Centre
605 McCowan Road
Toronto ON  M1J 1J9
Phone Number: (416) 439-1718

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY ROBERT SPROULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPROULE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987