Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Spruyt, Marlene Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algoma Public Health
294 Willow St.
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A9
Phone: 705 759 5421
Fax: (705) 759 2540
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marlene Spruyt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLENE ELIZABETH SPRUYT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRUYT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1986