Spurek, Monika (CPSO#: 80573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Church Street
suite 306
St Catharines ON  L2R 7E1
Phone: (905) 685-0707
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 16 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONIKA SPUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPUREK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2004 to 02 May 2004
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 19 Nov 2007 to 20 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008