Spurrell, Richard Mark (CPSO#: 95178)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017